With our Worksheet on Multiplicand and Multiplier provided you can learn about Basic Multiplication Facts as well as learn how to multiply numbers in columns. Practice various questions on multiplying numbers having larger numbers and learn how the entire process works. Multiplicand and Multiplier Worksheet with Answers will bring out mental math ability in you as well enhances your numerical skills. Download the Multiplicand and Multiplier Worksheets for free and ace up your preparation.

Do Check:

**Find the product of the following Examples
Example 1:
** 4955 × 452

**Solution:**

Write the bigger number 4955 on the top and the smaller number 452 below. Place the multiplication symbol on left. Lineup the numbers.

Multiply digits of the top by units digit of the bottom. write the partial product 9910 below.

Multiply digits of the top by tens digit of the bottom. write the partial product 24775 below as shown in the figure.

Multiply digits of the top by hundreds of the bottom. write the partial product 19820 below as shown in the figure.

add the partial products and place them below the line i.e. 2239660.

Hence, the product of 4955,452 is 2239660.

**Example 2:
**6458 ×522

**Solution:**

Write the bigger number 6458 on the top and the smaller number 522 below. Place the multiplication symbol on left. Lineup the numbers.

Multiply digits of the top by units digit of the bottom. write the partial product 12916 below.

Multiply digits of the top by tens digit of the bottom. write the partial product 12916 below as shown in the figure.

Multiply digits of the top by hundreds of the bottom. write the partial product 32290 below as shown in the figure.

add the partial products and place them below the line i.e. 3371076.

Therefore, the product of 6458,522 is 3371076.

**Example 3:
**439 × 145

**Solution:**

Write the bigger number 439 on the top and the smaller number 145 below. Place the multiplication symbol on left. Lineup the numbers.

Multiply digits of the top by units digit of the bottom. write the partial product 2195 below.

Multiply digits of the top by tens digit of the bottom. write the partial product 1756 below as shown in the figure.

Multiply digits of the top by hundreds of the bottom. write the partial product 439 below as shown in the figure.

add the partial products and place them below the line i.e. 63655.**
**Therefore, the product of 439 × 145 is 63655.

**Example 4:
**3654 × 384

**Solution:**

Write the bigger number 3654 on the top and the smaller number 384 below. Place the multiplication symbol on left. Lineup the numbers.

Multiply digits of the top by units digit of the bottom. write the partial product 14616 below.

Multiply digits of the top by tens digit of the bottom. write the partial product 29232 below as shown in the figure.

Multiply digits of the top by hundreds of the bottom. write the partial product 10962 below as shown in the figure.

add the partial products and place them below the line i.e. 1403136.**
**Hence, the product of 3654,384 is 1403136.

**Example 5:
**Find the product of 3699, 456

**Solution: **

Write the bigger number 3699 on the top and the smaller number 456 below. Place the multiplication symbol on left. Lineup the numbers.

Multiply digits of the top by units digit of the bottom. write the partial product 22194 below.

Multiply digits of the top by tens digit of the bottom. write the partial product 18495 below as shown in the figure.

Multiply digits of the top by hundreds of the bottom. write the partial product 14796 below as shown in the figure.

add the partial products and place them below the line i.e. 1686744.

Hence the product of 3699 × 456= 1686744.

**Example 6:
**Rohith’s salary is Rs 25560. How much will he get salary for 12 months?

**Solution:**

Salary for rohit=Rs 25560

Salary for 12 months=25560 × 12

** **

Therefore, Rohith’s salary for twelve months= 306720.

**Example 7:
**In a store, there are 300 dresses. Each dress cost 1280. Find the cost of 300 dresses?

**Solution:**

No of dresses in a store= 300

The cost of each dress =1280

The cost of 300 dresses=1280 × 300

Hence, the cost of 300 dresses is 384000.

**Example 8:
**Raghu and his friends started a company. The company got profits and they decided to give the bonus amount of Rs 7850 to everyone. If the company has 235 employees, find the amount of money required to give the bonus?

**Solution:**

No. of employees in the company= 235

Bonus amount distributed to every one= Rs 7850

The amount required to give the bonus= 7850 ×235

Hence, the amount required to give the bonus=1844750.

**Example 9:
**If a car travels 100 km a day. How many kilometers does a car travel in 45 days?

**Solution:**

No. of kilometers a car travels in a day=100 km

No. of kilometers a car travels in 45 days=100 × 45=4500.

Therefore, the car travels 4500 km in 45 days.

**Example 10:
**The cost of a laptop is 28950. Find how much many required for buying 15 laptops?

**Solution:**

The cost of one laptop =28950

The cost of 15 laptops=28950 ×15

Hence, the cost of 15 laptops is 434250.

**Example 11:
**If a company produces 1000 cars every month. Find how many cars it produces in 12 months?

**Solution:**

No. of cars a company produces every month= 1000

No. of cars a company will produce in 12 months= 1000 × 12=12000.

Hence, the company produces 12000 cars in 12 months.

** **