 # Worksheet on Adding Money | Printable Adding Money Word Problems Worksheets

Worksheets are the best source for the students to practice the problems on Worksheet on Adding Money. The addition of money is the same as adding the whole numbers and decimals numbers. The addition of money can be done by using regrouping and non-regrouping method or conversion and without conversion method. Worksheet on Adding Money includes questions and answers with step-by-step explanations.

The addition of Money worksheets helps your child to count and recognize different amounts from all the countries around the world. Let us see how to add money for each country listed in the below section. With the help of the Worksheet on Adding Money, the students can score good marks in the exams. The worksheet on adding money is very easy to use and helps you understand the concept better.

Question 1.
Add the money Rs. 40.05, Rs. 17.01

Solution:

Adding money is possible with horizontal sum or vertical sum.
We arrange rupees and paise in columns and add them as whole numbers.
Rs. 40.05
Rs. 17.01
Rs. 57.06
Thus the sum of the amount Rs. 40.05 and Rs. 17.01 is Rs. 57.06

Question 2.
Perform column addition money up to $10 for the following i.$7.24 + $1.52 ii.$4.32 + $5.27 iii.$5.75 + $1.18 Solution: i.$7.24 + $1.52 We arrange rupees and paise in columns and add them as whole numbers. ii.$4.32 + $5.27 We arrange rupees and paise in columns and add them as whole numbers. iii.$5.75 + $1.18 We arrange rupees and paise in columns and add them as whole numbers. Question 3. Find the sum of$31.80 and \$30.15 with money notation.

Solution:

We arrange rupees and paise in columns and add them as whole numbers. Question 4.
4. Convert in paise and then add the amount (without regrouping):
i. Rs. 74.60 + Rs. 10.43
ii. Rs. 36.25 + Rs. 12.33
iii. Rs. 43.25 + Rs. 27.31

Solution:

i. Rs. 74.60 + Rs. 10.43
Convert from Rupees to paise.
1 Rupee = 100 paise
74 Rupees = 74 × 100 = 7400 paise
7400 paise + 600 paise = 8000 paise
10 Rupees = 10 × 100 = 1000 paise
1000 + 430 = 1430 paise ii. Rs. 36.25 + Rs. 12.33
Convert from Rupees to paise.
1 Rupee = 100 paise
36 Rupees = 36 × 100 = 3600 paise
3600 + 250 = 3850 paise
12 Rupees = 12 × 100 = 1200 paise
1200 + 330 = 1530 paise iii. Rs. 43.25 + Rs. 27.31
Convert from Rupees to paise.
1 Rupee = 100 paise
43 Rupees = 43 × 100 = 4300 paise
4300 + 250 = 4550 paise
27 Rupees = 27 × 100 = 2700 paise
2700 + 310 = 3010 paise Question 5.
Convert in paise and then add (with regrouping):
i. Rs. 21.48 + Rs. 57.29
ii. Rs. 10.17 + Rs. 35.64
iii. Rs. 81.24 + Rs. 34.83

Solution:

i. Rs. 21.48 + Rs. 57.29
Convert from Rupees to paise.
1 Rupee = 100 paise
21 Rupees = 21 × 100 = 2100 paise
2100 + 480 = 2580 paise
57 Rupees = 57 × 100 = 5700 paise
5700 + 290 = 5990 paise ii. Rs. 10.17 + Rs. 35.64
Convert from Rupees to paise.
1 Rupee = 100 paise
10 Rupees = 10 × 100 = 1000 paise
1000 + 170 = 1170 paise
1 Rupee = 100 paise
35 Rupees = 35 × 100 = 3500 paise
3500 + 640 = 4140 paise iii. Rs. 81.24 + Rs. 34.83
Convert from Rupees to paise.
1 Rupee = 100 paise
81 Rupees = 81 × 100 = 8100 paise
8100 + 240 = 8340 paise
1 Rupee = 100 paise
34 Rupees = 34 × 100 = 3400 paise
3400 + 830 = 4230 paise Question 6.
Add the following money (without regrouping):
i. Rs. 144.25 + Rs. 21.10
ii. Rs. 30.50 + Rs. 10.25

Solution:

i. Rs. 144.25 + Rs. 21.10
We arrange rupees and paise in columns and add them as whole numbers. ii. Rs. 30.50 + Rs. 10.25
We arrange rupees and paise in columns and add them as whole numbers. Question 7.
i. Rs.77.19 + Rs.32.26
ii. Rs.23.16 + Rs.83.34

Solution:

i. Rs.77.19 + Rs.32.26
We arrange rupees and paise in columns and add them as whole numbers. ii. Rs.23.16 + Rs.83.34
We arrange rupees and paise in columns and add them as whole numbers. Question 8.
Add the amount Rs. 57.76 and Rs. 18.72 arranging in columns of rupees and paisa

Solution:

We arrange rupees and paise in columns and add them as whole numbers. Question 9.
Add the amount Rupees sixty-two and seventy-one and eighty-one and forty-five paise without conversion by regrouping method.

Solution:

We arrange rupees and paise in columns and add them as whole numbers.
Rupees sixty-two and seventy-one and eighty-one and forty-five paise
Rs. 62.71 + Rs. 81.45 Question 10.