Multiplication is a process of repeated addition. There are various methods to compute the product of two numbers. Here, you can check what is meant by multiply a number by a 2-digit number. Get the simple steps to Multiply a Number by a 2-Digit Number in the following sections. You can see the detailed process of finding the multiplication using three different methods.

**Also, Refer:**

- Column Method Multiplication
- Multiplication by 1-Digit Number
- Expansion Method of Multiplication
- Multiplication

## Multiply a Number by a 2-Digit Number

Multiplication of a number by a 2digit number means multiplicand should be a two-digit number, the multiplier should be more than 1 digit number. The two-digit number has both ten’s place and unit’s place. Follow any of the below-mentioned methods to find the product of a number by a 2 digit number.

### How to Multiply a Number by a 2-Digit Number?

Get the different methods of multiplication of a number by a two-digit number in the following sections.

**First Method:**

- Get any two numbers to perform the multiplication.
- Expand the numbers into a combination of tens, hundreds, ones.
- Use the distributive property for further expansion.
- Multiply the numbers and add them.
- The sum is the final product.

**Second Method:**

- Get multiplier and multiplicand and write them in two columns.
- Firstly, multiply the unit digit of the bottom number with a unit digit of the top number and write the result.
- Again, multiply the unit digit of the bottom number with the ten’s digit of the top number and write the result as tens.
- Likewise, multiply ten’s digit of a bottom with unit’s of top and so on.
- Add all the products to get the final result.

**Third Method:**

- Write the given numbers in two columns.
- Expand the 2 digit multiplicand into the sum of tens and ones.
- Multiply the unit digit of the bottom number by the top number and write the result as ones.
- Multiply the ten’s digit of the bottom number by the top number, write the product as tens.
- Add those products to get the result.

### Multiplying a Number by a 2-Digit Numbers Examples

**Example 1:**

Solve 1256 x 24 by the third method.

**Solution:**

Given that,

1256 x 24

Write 24 as 20 + 4

1256 x 4 = 5024

1256 x 20 = 25120

5024 + 25120 = 30144

So 1256 x 24 = 30144.

**Example 2:**

Compute 564 x 14 using the first method.

**Solution:**

Given that,

564 x 14

564 = 500 + 60 + 4

14 = 10 + 4

564 x 14 = (500 + 60 + 4) x (10 + 4)

= (500 + 60 + 4) x 10 + (500 + 60 + 4) x 4

= (5000 + 600 + 40) + (2000 + 240 + 16)

= 5640 + 2256

= 7896

Therefore, 564 x 14 = 7896.

**Example 3:**

Find 2793 x 56 using the second method?

**Solution:**

Given that,

2793 x 56

56 = 5 tens + 6 ones

2793 x 6 = 16758 ones

2793 x 5 tens = 13965 tens

16758 + 13965 tens = 156408

Therefore, 2793 x 56 = 156408.

**Example 4:**

Compute the 679 x 45 with three methods.

**Solution:**

Given that,

679 x 45

(i) Using the first method

679 = 600 + 70 + 9

45 = 40 + 5

679 x 45 = (600 + 70 + 9) x (40 + 5)

Using the distributive property

= (600 + 70 + 9) x 40 + (600 + 70 + 9) x 5

= (24000 + 2800 + 360) + (3000 + 350 + 45)

= 27160 + 3395

= 30,555

So 679 x 45 = 30,555

(ii) Using the second method or column method

45 = 4 tens + 5 ones

679 x 5 = 3395

679 x 4 tens = 2716 tens

2716 tens + 3395 = 30,555

So 679 x 45 = 30,555

(iii) Using third method

45 = 40 + 5

679 x 5 = 3395

679 x 40 = 27160

27160 + 3395 = 30,555

So 679 x 45 = 30,555

### FAQs on Multiplication by 2-Digit Numbers

**1. What is meant by Multiplication?**

Multiplication is one of the arithmetic operations. The formula of multiplication is multiplier x multiplicand = product. The multiplication of two numbers is also called the product of 2 numbers. The symbol of multiplication is x or dot (.).

**2. How do you multiply by a 2 digit number?**

First of all, write the numbers in two columns. Multiply the unit’s digit of the second number with all digits of the first numbers (in the order from right to left). Write the product below and again multiply the ten’s digit of the second number with all digits of the first number. Add those results to get the product.

**3. Compute 478 x 34.**

So, 478 x 34 = 140