All the solutions provided in **McGraw Hill Math Grade 5 Answer Key PDF Chapter 2 Lesson 10 Multiply by Two-Digit Numbers** will give you a clear idea of the concepts.

## McGraw-Hill My Math Grade 5 Answer Key Chapter 2 Lesson 10 Multiply by Two-Digit Numbers

Example 1

Domestic cats can run up to 44 feet per second on land. At this rate, how many feet could a cat run in 12 seconds?

Find 44 × 12.

Estimate 44 × 10 = ____

So, a domestic cat can run ___ feet in 12 seconds.

Check Compare to the estimate. ____ ≈ _____

Answer:

**Helpful Hint**

By estimating first, you can determine if your answer is reasonable.

Example 2

Find 165 × 31

Estimate 200 × 30 = ____

So, 165 × 31 = ____

Check Compare to the estimate ____ ≈ ____

Answer:

165 × 31 = 5115

**Talk Math**

Describe how addition is used when you multiply by two digit numbers.

Answer:

Multiplication is the repeated addition of the same number. When we add or combine groups of equal sizes successively, the product is called the multiplication product.

**Guided Practice**

Question 1.

Multiply 32 × 13.

Estimate 30 × 10 = _____

So, 32 × 13 = ____

Check for Reasonableness

_____ ≈ ____

Answer:

32 × 13 = 416

Estimate 30 × 10 = 300

416 > 300

**Independent Practice**

**Estimate. Then multiply. Use your estimate to check your answer.**

Question 2.

Answer:

1224

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 102 and the multiplier is 12.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 102 and multiplier 12, we get the value as 1224.

Question 3.

Answer:

1122

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 102 and the multiplier is 56.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 106 and multiplier 56, we get the value as 1122.

Question 4.

Answer:

504

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 24 and the multiplier is 21.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 24 and multiplier 21, we get the value as 504.

Question 5.

Answer:

1326

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 39 and the multiplier is 34.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 39 and multiplier 34, we get the value as 1326.

Question 6.

Answer:

702

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 13 and the multiplier is 54.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 13 and multiplier 54, we get the value as 702.

Question 7.

Answer:

4182

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 51 and the multiplier is 82.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 51 and multiplier 82, we get the value as 4182.

Question 8.

21 × 42 = ____

Answer:

882

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 21 and the multiplier is 42.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 21 and multiplier 42, we get the value as 882.

Question 9.

69 × 14 = ____

Answer:

996

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 69 and the multiplier is 14.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 69 and multiplier 14, we get the value as 996.

Question 10.

83 × 367 = ____

Answer:

30461

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 83 and the multiplier is 367.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 83 and multiplier 367, we get the value as 30461.

**Problem Solving**

Question 14.

Marshall’s mother buys 2 boxes of granola bars each week. Each box contains 8 granola bars. If she continues buying 2 boxes each week, how many granola bars will she buy in a year (1 year = 52 weeks)?

Answer:

832 granola bars.

Explanation:

If Marshall’s mother continues to buy two boxes each week Marshall’s mother will have 832.

Question 15.

**Mathematical PRACTICE 5** Use Math Tools A delivery truck travels 278 miles each day. How far does it travel in 25 days?

Answer:

6950

Explanation:

Given,

Speed = 278 miles

Time = 25 days

Distance = Speed × time

= 278 × 25

= 6950

Question 16.

A cow can eat 25 pounds of hay a day. At that rate, how many pounds of hay can a cow eat in 31 days?

Answer:

775 pounds

Explanation:

The cow eats 25 pounds of hay a day.

Can a cow eat in 31 days?

25 × 31 = 775

So the cow eats 775 pounds of hay in 31 days.

**Hot Problems**

Question 17.

**Mathematical PRACTICE 2** Use Number Sense Find 235 × 124. Use the same strategy that you used for multiplying by a two-digit number except include multiplying by the hundreds place.

Answer:

29140

Explanation:

235 × 124 = 29140

Question 18.

**? Building on the Essential Question** How do you multiply by two-digit numbers?

Answer:

Step 1: Estimate the product using the nearest ‘tens‘ to verify the answer.

Step 2: Multiply any one of the numbers by the ‘ones’ digit of the second number.

Step 3: Multiply the number by the tens digit of the number.

Step 4: Finally, add the two partial products to get the final product and verify it with the estimated product.

### McGraw Hill My Math Grade 5 Chapter 2 Lesson 10 My Homework Answer Key

**Practice**

**Estimate. Then multiply. Use your estimate to check your answer.**

Question 1.

Answer:

285

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 19 and the multiplier is 15.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 19 and multiplier 15, we get the value as 285.

Question 2.

Answer:

2795

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 43 and the multiplier is 65^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 43 and multiplier 65, we get the value as 2795.

Question 3.

470 × 56 = ____

Answer:

26320

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 470 and the multiplier is 56^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 470 and multiplier 56, we get the value as 26320.

**Problem Solving**

Question 4.

Ms. Jenkins was arranging chairs for a school awards assembly. Each row contained 15 chairs. If there were 21 rows, how many chairs had to be arranged?

Answer:

315 chairs had to be arranged.

Explanation:

Jenkins was arranging chairs for a school awards assembly

No of chairs in each row = 15

Then multiply the number of chairs in 21 rows

15 × 21 = 315

Question 5.

Leon earns $14 an hour. How much does he earn in 4 weeks if he works 12 hours each week?

Answer:

$672

Explanation:

He worked a total of 12 × 4 = 48

Then multiply that by 14 × 28 =672

$672

Question 6.

**Mathematical PRACTICE 5** **Use Math Tools** Without actually calculating, how much greater is the product of 98 × 50 than the product of 97 × 50?

Answer:

(98 – 97) × 50 = 1 × 50 = 50

98 × 50 is greater than 97 × 50 by 50.

Question 7.

The table shows Katrina’s prices for dog walking. If she walks 5 medium-sized dogs and 8 large-sized dogs for 12 weeks, how much will she earn?

Answer:

$2064

Explanation:

(5 × 12 + 8 × 14) × 12

(60 + 112) × 12

172 × 12

$2064

The buckets indicate the money earned each week.

**Test Practice**

Question 8.

Each day there are 12 tours at the glass factory. Twenty-eight people can go on a tour. How many people can tour the glass factory each day?

A. 236 people

B. 280 people

C. 336 people

D. 436 people

Answer:

336 people

Explanation:

Each day there are 12 tours at the glass factory, and on each tour 28 people can assist, in order to know how many people can tour the glass factory

12 × 28 = X

336 = X

**Fluency Practice Mathematical practice 6**

**Multiply**

Question 1.

Answer:

102

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 17 and the multiplier is 6.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 17 and multiplier 6, we get the value as 102.

Question 2.

Answer:

168

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 24 and the multiplier is 7.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 24 and multiplier 7, we get the value as 168.

Question 3.

Answer:

93

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 31 and the multiplier is 3.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 31 and multiplier 3, we get the value as 93.

Question 4.

Answer:

136

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 68 and the multiplier is 2.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 68 and multiplier 2, we get the value as 136.

Question 5.

Answer:

328

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 41 and the multiplier is 8.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 41 and multiplier 8, we get the value as 328.

Question 6.

Answer:

460

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 95 and the multiplier is 5.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 95 and multiplier 5, we get the value as 460.

Question 7.

Answer:

76

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 19 and the multiplier is 4.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 19 and multiplier 4, we get the value as 76.

Question 8.

Answer:

469

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 67 and the multiplier is 7.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 67 and multiplier 7, we get the value as 469.

Question 9.

Answer:

128

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 32 and the multiplier is 4.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 32 and multiplier 4, we get the value as 128.

Question 10.

Answer:

540

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 90 and the multiplier is 6.

By multiplying both multiplicand 90 and multiplier 6, we get the value as 540.

Question 11.

Answer:

166

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 83 and the multiplier is 2.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 83 and multiplier 2, we get the value as 166.

Question 12.

Answer:

310

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 62 and the multiplier is 5.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 62 and multiplier 5, we get the value as 310.

Question 13.

Answer:

162

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 18 and the multiplier is 9.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 18 and multiplier 9, we get the value as 162.

Question 14.

Answer:

190

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 38 and the multiplier is 5.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 38 and multiplier 5, we get the value as 190.

Question 15.

Answer:

156

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 26 and the multiplier is 6.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 26 and multiplier 6, we get the value as 156.

Question 16.

Answer:

592

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 74 and the multiplier is 8.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 74 and multiplier 8, we get the value as 592.

Question 17.

Answer:

435

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 87 and the multiplier is 5.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 87 and multiplier 5, we get the value as 435.

Question 18.

Answer:

371

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 53 and the multiplier is 7.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 53 and multiplier 7, we get the value as 371.

Question 19.

Answer:

147

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 49 and the multiplier is 3.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 49 and multiplier 3, we get the value as 147.

Question 20.

Answer:

284

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 71 and the multiplier is 4.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 71 and multiplier 4, we get the value as 284.

**Fluency Practice**

**Multiply.**

Question 1.

Answer:

253

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 11 and the multiplier is 23.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 11 and multiplier 23, we get the value as 253.

Question 2.

Answer:

2214

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 54 and the multiplier is 41.

By multiplying both multiplicand 54 and multiplier 41, we get the value as 2214.

Question 3.

Answer:

1140

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 76 and the multiplier is 15.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 76 and multiplier 15, we get the value as 1140.

Question 4.

Answer:

2240

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 35 and the multiplier is 64.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 2240 and multiplier 64, we get the value as 2240.

Question 5.

Answer:

270

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 27 and the multiplier is 10.

By multiplying both multiplicand 21 and multiplier 3, we get the value as 63.

Question 6.

Answer:

2937

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 89 and the multiplier is 33.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 89 and multiplier 33, we get the value as 2937.

Question 7.

Answer:

1968

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 41 and the multiplier is 48.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 41 and multiplier 48, we get the value as 1968.

Question 8.

Answer:

1196

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 92 and the multiplier is 13^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 92 and multiplier 13, we get the value as 1196.

Question 9.

Answer:

1575

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 63 and the multiplier is 25.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 63 and multiplier 25, we get the value as 1575.

Question 10.

Answer:

2613

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 39 and the multiplier is 67.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 39 and multiplier 67, we get the value as 2613.

Question 11.

Answer:

3560

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 89 and the multiplier is 40.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 89 and multiplier 40, we get the value as 3560.

Question 12.

Answer:

1596

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 19 and the multiplier is 84.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 19 and multiplier 84, we get the value as 1596.

Question 13.

Answer:

2834

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 218 and the multiplier is 13.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 218 and multiplier 13, we get the value as 2834.

Question 14.

Answer:

3848

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 104 and the multiplier is 37.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 104 and multiplier 37, we get the value as 3848.

Question 15.

Answer:

23946

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 921 and the multiplier is 26.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 921 and multiplier 26, we get the value as 23946.

Question 16.

Answer:

28080

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 585 and the multiplier is 48.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 585 and multiplier 48, we get the value as 28080.

Question 17.

Answer:

40260

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 732 and the multiplier is 55.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 732 and multiplier 55, we get the value as 40260.

Question 18.

Answer:

26623

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 337 and the multiplier is 79.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 337 and multiplier 79, we get the value as 26623.

Question 19.

Answer:

30080

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 376 and the multiplier is 80.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 376 and multiplier 80, we get the value as 30080.

Question 20.

Answer:

12460

Explanation:

Given multiplicand is 890 and the multiplier is 14.^{ }

By multiplying both multiplicand 890 and multiplier 14, we get the value as 12460.