# Column Method Multiplication – Definition, Examples | How to do Column Method Multiplication?

Are you confused about the column method multiplication? you landed on the correct page where you will get full information about column method multiplication. This includes the definition of the column method multiplication, steps to follow the column method multiplication. You can also find examples of column method multiplication by completely going through this article.

Do Refer: Expansion Method of Multiplication

## Column Method Multiplication | Long Multiplication

In column method multiplication, One number is written underneath another number and the numbers are multiplied together. It is also called long method multiplication.

For example 3Â  5

*2Â  5

â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“

8Â  Â  7Â  Â 5

â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“

### Column Method Multiplication 3 Digit by 2 Digit

The steps to be followed for the column method multiplication of a three-digit number by a two-digit number isÂ  as follows:

1. Multiply the one’s digit of the number by one’s digit of the multiplier.
2. Multiply the tens digit of the number by one’s digit of the number.
3. Multiply the Hundred’s digit of the number by one’s digit of the multiplier.
4. Multiply the one’s digit of the number by the tens digit of the multiplier.
5. Multiply the tens digit of the number by the tens digit of the number.
6. Multiply the Hundred’s digit of the number by the tens digit of the multiplier.

The same procedure has to be followed for the multiplication of the two-digit number by the two-digit number.

### Examples of Column Method Multiplication

Example 1:

Multiply 53, 23 by column method multiplication.

Solution:

1. Multiply the multiplicand by one’s digit of the multiplier.

5 3

*3ones

â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”

1Â  5Â  9

â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”

2. Multiply the multiplicand by tens digit of the multiplier.

5Â  Â 3

*2tens

â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“

1Â  Â 0Â  Â 6

â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“

159 ones+106 tens

=159*1+106*10

=159+1060

=1,219.

The product of 53,23 is 1,219.

It meansÂ  Â 5Â  Â 3

*Â  Â 2Â  3

â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“

1Â  Â  Â  5Â  Â  Â  9Â  Â  Â  Â  Â  Â  Â  Â —->Â  Â 53*3=159

1Â  Â  Â  Â  Â 0Â  Â  Â  Â 6Â  Â  Â 0Â  Â  Â  Â  Â  Â  Â  Â —->Â  53*20=1060

1

â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“

1Â  Â  Â  Â  Â 2Â  Â  Â  Â 1Â  Â  Â  Â 9Â  Â  Â  Â  Â  Â  Â  Â  Â  Â ——>53*23=1219

â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“

Example 2:

Find Multiplication of 455,32 by column method multiplication?

Solution:

1. Multiply the multiplicand by one’s digit of the multiplier.

4Â  5Â  Â 5

* 2 ones

â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“

9Â  Â  Â 1Â  Â  Â 0

â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“

2. Multiply the multiplicand by tens digit of the multiplier.

4Â  Â  5Â  Â  5

*3tens

â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“

1 3 6Â  5

â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“

910 ones+1365tens

=910*1+1365*10

=910+13650

=14560.

Multiplication of 455,32 is 14560.

It means

4Â  Â  5Â  Â  Â 5

*3Â  Â  Â 2

â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“

9Â  Â  Â 1Â  Â  Â 0Â  Â  Â  Â  Â  Â  Â —->455*2=910

1Â  Â  3Â  Â 6Â  Â  5Â  Â  Â 0Â  Â  Â  Â  Â  Â  —–>455*30=13650

1

â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“

1Â  Â  4Â  Â  Â  5Â  Â  Â 6Â  Â  0Â  Â  Â  Â  Â  Â  Â  Â —–>455*32=14560

â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“

Example 3:

Find the multiplication of 1234,34 by column method Multiplication.

Solution:

1. Multiply the multiplicand by one’s digit of the multiplier.

1Â  Â  2Â  Â  3Â  Â 4

*4ones

â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“

4Â  Â 9Â  Â  Â  3Â  Â  Â 6

â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“

2. Multiply the multiplicand by tens digit of the multiplier.

1Â  Â 2Â  Â 3Â  Â  4

*3 tens

â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“

3Â  7Â  Â 0Â  Â  2

â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“

1234*4ones+1234*3tens

=1234*4+1234*30

=4936+37020

=41,956.

Similarly, we can do multiplication of the four-digit number, multiplication of the five-digit number by two-digit numbers.

### Column Method Multiplication of 4 Digit by 2 Digit Examples

Example 1:

Find the multiplication of 34251,62 by column method multiplication?

Solution:

1.Multiply the multiplicand by one’s digit of the multiplier.

3Â  Â 4Â  2Â  Â 5Â  1

*2

â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“

6Â  8 5Â  Â  Â 0Â  Â  2

â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“

2.Multiply the multiplicand by tens digit of the multiplier.

3Â  Â 4Â  2Â  5Â  1

*6 tens

â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“

2 , 0 5,Â  5Â  0 6

â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“â€”â€”â€“