Students looking for the **Bridges in Mathematics Grade 5 Home Connections Answer Key**** Unit 4 Module 1** can find a better approach to solve the problems.

## Bridges in Mathematics Grade 5 Home Connections Answer Key Unit 4 Module 1

**Bridges in Mathematics Grade 5 Home Connections Unit 4 Module 1 Session 1 Answer Key**

**Number Review**

Here is a completed box challenge puzzle. If you look at it closely, you’ll see that the number at the top is the product of the two numbers on the left and right, and the number at the bottom is the sum of the two numbers on the left and right.

3 × 5 = 15

3 + 15 = 18

Question 1.

Fill in the blanks to complete each of the box challenge puzzles below. Remember that the number at the top is the product of the two numbers on the sides, and the number at the bottom is the sum of the two numbers on the sides.

Answer:

Explanation:

Given from above boxes completed the challenge box as the number at the top is the product of the two numbers on the sides, and the number at the bottom is the sum of the two numbers on the sides.

Question 2.

Evaluate each expression.

a. (14 × 3) × 10

Answer:

420,

Explanation:

Given from above expression first multiply the brackets and then multiply with the other number then we get 42 X 10 = 420.

b. 4 × (9 × 20)

Answer:

720,

Explanation:

Given from above expression first multiply the brackets and then multiply with the other number then we get 4 X 180 = 720.

c. (600 ÷ 20) × 5

Answer:

150,

Explanation:

Given from above expression first divide the brackets numbers that is 600/20= 30 now multiply with the other number. So 30 X 5 = 150.

d. 99 × (99 + 1)

Answer:

9,900,

Explanation:

Given from above expression first add the brackets one that is 99 + 1 = 100 and then multiply with 99 that is 99 X 100 = 9900.

Question 3.

Julia said that she solved the problem 360 ÷ 12 by dividing 36 by 12 and then multiplying her answer by 10. Write an expression to show her thinking.

Answer:

( 36 ÷ 12) X 10 = 30,

Explanation:

Given from above first write division expression that is 360 / 12 then multiply with 10 therefore the expression is ( 36 ÷ 12) X 10.

Question 4.

Lucas said he solved 360 ÷ 12 by multiplying 12 by 3 and then multiplying the product by 10. Write an expression to show his thinking.

Answer:

(12 X 3) X 10 = 360,

Explanation:

Given from above first multiply 12 X 3 and then multiply the product by 10. So, expression is (12 X 3) X 10.

Question 5.

Who got the correct quotient (answer), Julia or Lucas?

Answer:

Julia got correct answer,

Explanation:

As Julia divided first 36 by 12 their she got quotient is 3 and multiplied by 10.

Question 6.

Billy said that he thinks 30 × 176 is three times larger than 10 × 176. Do you agree or disagree? Explain your thinking.

Answer:

Yes, I agree,

Explanation:

Given that 30 X 176 is three times larger than 10 X 176 we can write as 3 X 10 X 176 = 30 X 176, Yes its possible .

Question 7.

Write the following decimals in standard form.

a. 1,000 + 6 + 0.1 + 0.003

Answer:

1,006.103,

Explanation:

Given from the above question calculated the sum that is 1,000 + 6.00 + 0.1 + 0.003 = 1,006.103.

b. Fourteen and three hundred ninety-seven thousandths

Answer:

14.397,

Explanation:

Given that number name of fourteen and three hundred ninety-seven thousandths is 14.397 respectively.

Question 8.

Write the following decimals in word form.

a. 10 + 0.06 + 0.008

Answer:

Ten and six hundredths eight thousandths,

Explanation:

Given the decimal form is 10 + 0.06 + 0.008 so, ten is whole number and six is in hundredths place ,8 is thousandths place so therefore word form is ten and sixty eight thousandths respectively.

b. 40.545

Answer:

Forty and five hundred forty – five thousandths,

Explanation:

As we know that forty is whole number and after decimal point the place values are five hundred forty five thousandths respectively.

Question 9.

Write the following decimals in expanded notation.

a. Seven hundred twenty-two and sixteen-thousandths

Answer:

700 + 20 + 2 + 0.01 + 0.006 = 722.016,

Explanation:

As we know that expanded notation for seven hundred twenty two is 722 and in sixteen thousandths one is in hundredths place six is in thousandths place that is 016 so therefore 722.016.

b. 938.120

Answer:

900 + 30 + 8 + 0.1 + 0.02 + 0.000,

Explanation:

As we know that 938 = 900 + 30 + 8 and after decimal point the 1 is is tenths place, 2 is in hundredths place and 0 is in thousandths place, so 0.1 + 0.02 + 0.000 so, therefore 900 + 30 + 80.1 0.002 0.000.

Question 10.

Compare the decimals. Fill in each blank with <, >, or =.

a. 160.30 160.03

Answer:

160.30 > 160.03,

Explanation:

Given as we know that whole numbers are same for both decimal numbers that is 160 = 160 after decimal point see the tenths place that is 3 > 0. So therefore 160.30 > 160.03.

b. 7.098 7.908

Answer:

7.098 < 7.908 ,

Explanation:

Given as we know that whole numbers are same for both decimal numbers that is 7 = 7 and after decimal point see the tenths place which is 0 < 9 so therefore 7.098 < 7.908.

c. 3.071 3.701

Answer:

3.071 < 3.701,

Explanation:

Given as we know that whole numbers are same for both the decimal numbers that is 3 = 3 and after decimal point see the tenths place which is 0 < 7 so therefore 3.071 < 3.701.

d. 90.0 0.90

Answer:

90.0 > 0.90 ,

Explanation:

Given that as we know whole numbers for both decimal numbers are not same that is 90 > 0 so, therefore 90.0 > 0.90 respectively.

**Bridges in Mathematics Grade 5 Home Connections Unit 4 Module 1 Session 3 Answer Key**

**Thinking About Strategy**

Question 1.

Complete the box challenges below.

a.

Answer:

b.

Answer:

Explanation:

Given from above boxes completed the challenge box as the number at the top is the product of the two numbers on the sides, and the number at the bottom is the sum of the two numbers on the sides.

Question 2.

The craft store sells large boxes of modeling clay that hold 18 sticks each. Complete the ratio table to find out how many sticks there are in different numbers of boxes.

Answer:

Explanation:

Given number of sticks clay contains is 18 so ,now for each large boxes number of sticks are 2 X 18 = 36 ; 3 X 18 = 54 ; 5 X 18=90 ; 10 X 18=180 ; 50 X 18=900 ; 55 X 18 = 990 and completed the table .

Question 3.

You can also buy small boxes of modeling clay at the craft store for $3.50 each. Find out how much it would cost to buy different numbers of small boxes of clay.

Answer:

Explanation:

Given from the table cost of modeling clay at craft store is $3.50 so, the of small boxes are 2 X $3.50 = $7 ; 10 X $3.50 = 35 ; 20 X $3.50 = $70 ; 19 X $3.50 = $66.5 ; 40 X $3.50 = $140 ; 39 X 3.50 = $136.5.

Question 4.

Solve the problems in the string below. Use the answers from the first few combinations to help solve the rest.

a. 36 × 10

b. 36 × 5

c. 36 × 15

d. 36 × 100

e. 36 × 50

f. 1,872 ÷ 36

Answer:

a. 36 X 10 = 360,

b. 36 X 5 = 180,

c. 36 X 15 = 540,

d. 36 X 100 = 3600,

e. 36 X 50 = 1800,

f. 1,872 ÷ 36 = 52,

Explanation:

Solved the problems in the string using the answers from the first few combinations to help solve the rest.

Question 5.

Solve the problems in this string.

a. 36 ÷ 18

b. 72 ÷ 18

c. 108 ÷ 18

d. 180 ÷ 18

e. 1800 ÷ 18

f. 18 × 99

Answer:

a. 36 ÷ 18 = 2,

b. 72 ÷ 18 = 4,

c. 108 ÷ 18 = 6,

d. 180 ÷ 18 = 10,

e. 1800 ÷ 18 = 100,

f. 18 × 99 = 1,782,

Explanation:

Given from above solved the problems .

Question 6.

**CHALLENGE** Noah loves the Half-Tens facts and often uses them to solve multiplication problems. Make up a 2-digit by 3-digit multiplication problem for which using Half-Ten facts is efficient. Then, solve the problem using that strategy.

Answer:

Multiplying a three-digit number times 50 or multiplying 500 times a two – digit number. So, half tens is a way of multiplying where we have to find the value of given numbers. First we double any ‘one’ of the two given numbers and multiply both to get an answer ,then we divide that answer by ‘2’ to get the answer.

Explanation:

Given from above let’s take one example 862 X 50 = 862 X 100 ÷ 2,

= 86,200 ÷ 2

= 43,100.

500 x 72 = 1,000 x 72 ÷2

= 72,000 ÷ 2

= 36,000.