Students of Grade 4 spend more time-solving multiplication topics such as mental math multiplication, multi-digit multiplication. Use our comprehensive collection of 4th Grade Math Multiplication Worksheets PDF for free and ace your preparation. Math Worksheets on Multiplication for Class 4 provided will have questions ranging from easy to difficult ones. Multiplying Worksheets with Answers makes it easy for you to develop mental math multiplication skills right in your head, multiply in columns, etc.

Do Check:

**I. Multiply the numbers given below
**1. Multiply the numbers 132 and 24

**Solution:**

1. Arrange the number 132 one on top as the multiplicand and 24 at the bottom. Line up the place values in columns.

2. Starting with the one’s digit of the bottom number, i.e. 4 × 2=8. Write the answer below the equals line

3. Multiply the one digit of the bottom number to the next digit to the left in the top number i.e. i.e. 4 × 3=12. Here the answer is greater than nine, write2 in the one’s place as the answer and carry the tens digit 1 Proceed right to left.

4. Multiply 4 with 1.i.e. 4 × 1=4. Add the carry forward digit 1 to 4.Write 5 as the answer.

5. Move to the tens digit in the bottom number i.e. 2. Multiply as above, but this time write your answers in a new row, shifted one digit place to the left.

6. Multiply 2 with 2 i.e. 2 × 2=4.

Multiply 2 with 3 i.e. 2 × 3=6

Multiply 2 with 1 i.e. 2 × 1=2

7. After multiplying, draw another answer line below the last row of answer numbers.

8. Use long addition to add the number columns from right to left, carrying as you normally do for long addition.

Therefore, the product of 132 and 24 is 3168.

2. Multiply the numbers 543 and 12

**Solution:**

1. Arrange the number 543 one on top as the multiplicand and 12 at the bottom. Line up the place values in columns.

2. Starting with the one’s digit of the bottom number, i.e. 2 × 3=6. Write the answer below the equals line

3. Multiply the one digit of the bottom number to the next digit to the left in the top number i.e. i.e. 2 × 4=8. Write 8 as the answer.

4. Move to the tens digit in the bottom number i.e. 1. Multiply as above, but this time write your answers in a new row, shifted one digit place to the left.

6. Multiply 1 with 3 i.e. 1 × 3=3.

Multiply 1 with 4 i.e. 1 × 4=4

Multiply 1 with 5 i.e. 1 × 5=5

7. After multiplying, draw another answer line below the last row of answer numbers.

8. Use long addition to add the number columns from right to left, carrying as you normally do for long addition.

Therefore, the product of 543 and 12 is 6516.

3. Multiply the numbers 2158 and 35

**Solution:**

1. Arrange the number 2158 on top as the multiplicand and 35 at the bottom. Line up the place values in columns.

2. Starting with the one’s digit of the bottom number, i.e. 5 × 8=40. Write 0 as the answer and carry forward 4.

3. Multiply the one digit of the bottom number to the next digit to the left in the top number i.e. i.e. 5× 5=25. Add the carry forward 4 to the 25 i.e. 25+4=29. write 9 in the one’s place as the answer and carry the tens digit 2 Proceed right to left.

4. Multiply 5 with 1. i.e. 5 × 1=5. Add the carry forward digit 2 to 5.Write 7 as the answer.

5. Multiply 5 with 2. i.e. 5 × 2=10. Write 10 as the answer.

5. Move to the tens digit in the bottom number i.e. 3. Multiply as above, but this time write your answers in a new row, shifted one digit place to the left.

6. Multiply 3 with 8 i.e. 3 × 8=24. Write 4 as answer and carryforward 2.

Multiply 3 with 5 i.e. 3 × 5=15. Add the carry forward 2 to 15 i.e.15+2=17. Write 7 as the answer and carry forward 1.

Multiply 3 with 1 i.e. 3 × 1=3. Add the carry forward 1 to 3 i.e. 3+1=4. Write 4 as the answer.

Multiply 3 with 2 i.e. 3 × 2=6. Write 4 as the answer.

7. After multiplying, draw another answer line below the last row of answer numbers.

8. Use long addition to add the number columns from right to left, carrying as you normally do for long addition.

Therefore, the product of 2158 and 35 is 75530.

**II.**

1. Find the number which is twice of 3478?

**Solution:**

1.Start multiplying with one’s place digits. i.e. 2 × 8=16. Write 6 as the answer and carry forward 1.

2. Multiply tens. i.e. 2 × 4=8. Add carry forward 1 to 8 i.e. 8+1=9. Write 6 as the answer.

3. Multiply Hundreds. i.e. 2 × 7=14. Write 4 as the answer and carry forward 1.

4. Multiply thousands. i.e. 2 × 3=6. Add carry forward 1to 6 i.e. 6+1=7. Write 7 as the answer.

Therefore, twice as of 3478 is 7496.

2. Find the number which is thrice of 124?

**Solution:**

1.Start multiplying with one’s place digits. i.e. 3 × 4=12. Write 2 as the answer and carry forward 1.

2. Multiply tens. i.e. 3 × 2=6. Add carry forward 1 to 6 i.e. 6+1=7. Write 7 as the answer.

3. Multiply Hundreds. i.e. 3 × 1=3. Write 3 as the answer.

Therefore, thrice as of 124 is 372.

**III. Estimate the product by rounding the given numbers
**1.

S.No | Question | Rounded numbers | Estimated product | Exact product | Which is Bigger |
---|---|---|---|---|---|

1 | 128 × 23 | Nearest 10’s | |||

2 | 250 × 35 | Nearest 10’s | |||

3 | 570 × 48 | Nearest 10’s |

**Solution:**

S.No | Question | Rounded numbers | Estimated product | Exact product | Which is Bigger |
---|---|---|---|---|---|

1 | 128 × 23 | Nearest 10’s | 442000 | 447496 | Exact product |

2 | 250 × 35 | Nearest 10’s | 10000 | 8750 | Estimated product |

3 | 570 × 48 | Nearest 10’s | 28500 | 27360 | estimated product |

**IV. **Sandhya bought 8 chocolate packets to distribute on her birthday. Each packet has 110 chocolates. Find how many chocolates were there in 8 packets?

**Solution:**

Given,

No. of chocolate packets Sandhya bought=8

No. of chocolates in each packet=110

Total no. of chocolates in each packet=110 × 8=880

Therefore, No. of chocolates in 8 packets is 880.

**V. **Arjun’s monthly salary is Rs 35000. Arun’s monthly salary is three times that of Arjun. Find how much salary does Arun earns?

**Solution:**

Given,

Arjun’s monthly salary is =Rs 35000

Arun’s monthly salary is three times that of Arjun=3 × Rs 35000=Rs105000

Therefore, Aruns monthly salary is Rs 1,05,000.

**VI. **In a class there are 20 students. Each student has 15 books. Find out the total no. of books do students have?

**Solution:**

Given,

No. of students in the class=20

No. of books each student have=15

Total no. of books students have=20 × 15=300

Therefore, students have a total of 300 books.

**VII. **There are 250 papers in a bundle. How many papers were there in 6 bundles?

**Solution:**

Given,

No. of papers in a bundle=250

No. of papers in 6 bundles=250 × 6=1500.

Therefore, the total no. of papers in 6 bundles is 1500.

**VIII. **Raju does typing work and earns money of Rs 530 every day. Find out how much money will Raju earn if he works for 30 days?

**Solution:**

Given,

Raju earns money every day=Rs 530

Money earned by Raju if he works for 30 days=Rs 530 × 30=Rs 15900

Therefore, the total money earned by Raju in 30 days is Rs 15900.

**IX. Choose the correct answers
**1. 638 × 16=_____

a. 10250

b. 10208 b

c. 10100

2. 848 × 24=______

a. 21524

b. 20245

c. 20352 c

3. The number to be multiplied by another is called ______

a. Product

b. multiplier

c. Multiplicand c

4. The number that you are multiplying by is called ______

a. Multiplier

b. Product

c. Multiplicand

5. 25 × 3 × 0=______

a. 0

b. 75

c. 85

6. Thrice of 65 =_____

a. 165

b. 195

c. 155

7. The product of 6 and 8 is same as the product of 4 and _____

a. 8

b. 12

c. 14

**Solution:**

1. b

2. c

3. c

4. a

5. a

6. b

7. b